This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 10:27:36 (UTC).

Williams et al v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03603

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harry E Williams, III

Alysse R Williams

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAY W. CHAMBERLIN

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16949125.), filed by Harry E Williams, III, Alysse R Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(CHAMBERLIN, JAY) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2023) (sbt). (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/18/23. (jaa, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND IT APPEARING THAT THE PARTIES RESIDE IN AND THE OPERATIVE FACTS OCCURRED IN THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE PLAINTIFFS SHALL, NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 20, 2023, FILE A STATEMENT SHOWING CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/18/23. 9/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, ) Modified on 9/18/2023 (jaa, ). (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/25/23. 9/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, ) Modified on 9/25/2023 (jaa, ). (Entered: 09/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #4 TO UNREP ON 9/26/23. (jaa, ) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA VIA CM/ECF ELECTRONIC TRANSFER. (jaa, ) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/25/23. 9/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, ) Modified on 9/25/2023 (jaa, ). (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDoc. 3 mailed to urnep. (er) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND IT APPEARING THAT THE PARTIES RESIDE IN AND THE OPERATIVE FACTS OCCURRED IN THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE PLAINTIFFS SHALL, NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 20, 2023, FILE A STATEMENT SHOWING CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/18/23. 9/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, ) Modified on 9/18/2023 (jaa, ). (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/18/23. (jaa, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16949125.), filed by Harry E Williams, III, Alysse R Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(CHAMBERLIN, JAY) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2023) (sbt). (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less