This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2023 at 08:48:28 (UTC).

Cuara R. v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2023 Cuara R filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S Customs and Border Protection. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Shelby and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Shelby

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Constantino Cuara R.

Defendants

International Cannabis Bar

U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Ports America Corporate

American Association of Airport

U.S. Federal Reserve

Wells Fargo

Wachovia Bank

New York

Central Intelligence Agency

FBI

CISA

Trading Commission

American Trucking

National Cannabis Industry

INCBA

 

Court Documents

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of complaint. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jl) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PLAINTIFF - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Constantino Cuara R.. Form due by 9/12/2023. (mh) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen his complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2 (b). Mr. Cuara may complete and return forms provided by the court. The Clerks Office is directed to provide Mr. Cuara with the email filing and electronic notification form for unrepresented parties. Other than court forms, Mr. Cuara must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. If such documents are filed, they will be lodged on the docket and will not be addressed until screening is complete. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If the action is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/23/2023. (haa) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against American Association of Airport, American Trucking, CISA, Central Intelligence Agency, FBI, International Cannabis Bar, National Cannabis Industry, New York, Ports America Corporate, Trading Commission, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Federal Reserve, Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo (Originally received by the court on 08/21/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Constantino Cuara R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Inv. Account, Bank Info and Prints, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (haa) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit 1 Inv. Account, Bank Info and Prints

5 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. Mr. Rodriguez may file an amended complaint by October 5, 2023. The words "Amended Complain" should appear in the caption of the document. Mr. Rodriguez is advised that an amended complaint will completely replace all prior versions of the complaint and claims which are not realleged in the amended pleading will be deemed abandoned. Once filed, the court will screen the amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2(b). Other than an amended complaint, the restriction on filing motions or other documents set forth in the court's August 23, 2023, #4 order remains in place. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/14/2023. (mh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2023

Docket(#8) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Mr. Cuara Rodriguez filed approximately 49 cases in this court between July 6, 2023, and September 18, 2023. Chief Judge Robert J. Shelby finds that the reassignment of this case is necessary for the efficient administration of justice. Therefore, under DUCivR 83-2(a)(2), the Chief Judge sua sponte orders the clerks office to transfer this case to Judge Shelby. The initial referral to the magistrate judge is vacated. Upon transfer, the case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Any new case filed by Mr. Cuara Rodriguez in this district after September 18, 2023, shall be assigned or reassigned to Judge Shelby and referred to Magistrate Judge Bennett under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/22/2023. (alf) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. Mr. Rodriguez may file an amended complaint by October 5, 2023. The words "Amended Complain" should appear in the caption of the document. Mr. Rodriguez is advised that an amended complaint will completely replace all prior versions of the complaint and claims which are not realleged in the amended pleading will be deemed abandoned. Once filed, the court will screen the amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2(b). Other than an amended complaint, the restriction on filing motions or other documents set forth in the court's August 23, 2023, #4 order remains in place. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/14/2023. (mh) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow and Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against American Association of Airport, American Trucking, CISA, Central Intelligence Agency, FBI, International Cannabis Bar, National Cannabis Industry, New York, Ports America Corporate, Trading Commission, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Federal Reserve, Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo (Originally received by the court on 08/21/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Constantino Cuara R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Inv. Account, Bank Info and Prints, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (haa) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen his complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2 (b). Mr. Cuara may complete and return forms provided by the court. The Clerks Office is directed to provide Mr. Cuara with the email filing and electronic notification form for unrepresented parties. Other than court forms, Mr. Cuara must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. If such documents are filed, they will be lodged on the docket and will not be addressed until screening is complete. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If the action is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/23/2023. (haa) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PLAINTIFF - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Constantino Cuara R.. Form due by 9/12/2023. (mh) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of complaint. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jl) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/21/2023) filed by Plaintiff Constantino Cuara R.. (jl) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less