This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2023 at 08:31:46 (UTC).

Art Ask Agency v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 Art Ask Agency filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02163

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Art Ask Agency

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by June 28, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#17

(#17) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jk2, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

10 #3

Declaration Hierl Declaration

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Art Ask Agency; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20515032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by June 28, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jk2, ) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Strid Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Strid Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Strid Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Strid Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Strid Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Strid Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM by Art Ask Agency in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Strid Declaration, #2 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #4 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, ) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Art Ask Agency; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20515032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less