This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2023 at 08:58:59 (UTC).

DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC. v. BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Elizabeth A. Pascal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03018

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Pascal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

District Veterans Contracting, Inc.

Defendants

BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC doing business as ADUDDELL INDUSTRIES

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARAH RACHEL GOODMAN

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC served on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/27/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

7 #5

Exhibit 5

7 #4

Exhibit 4

7 #3

Exhibit 3

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC, THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#3

(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by District Veterans Contracting, Inc.. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by District Veterans Contracting, Inc.. (GOODMAN, SARAH) Modified on 6/5/2023 (tf, ). (Entered: 06/02/2023)

1 #5

Exhibit Exh. 5

1 #4

Exhibit Exh. 4

1 #3

Exhibit Exh. 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exh. 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exh. 1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC served on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/27/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC, THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 submitted by SARAH GOODMAN on 6/7/23 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DISTRICT VETERANS CONTRACTING, INC.. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jab) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BROCK LOGISTICS, LLC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 6/5/2023. (jab) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jurisdiction,Jury Demand - Docket entry #2 appears to have been sealed accidentally, the Clerk's Office has unsealed the document,Party Information - Parties should be entered in ALL CAPS, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by District Veterans Contracting, Inc.. (GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by District Veterans Contracting, Inc.. (GOODMAN, SARAH) Modified on 6/5/2023 (tf, ). (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14359485), filed by District Veterans Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3, #4 Exhibit Exh. 4, #5 Exhibit Exh. 5)(GOODMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less