This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2023 at 07:41:43 (UTC).

Misra v. Scott et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 Misra filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis A. Kaplan and Jennifer E Willis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis A. Kaplan

Referral Judge

Jennifer E Willis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mona Misra

Defendants

Marcus Scott

Lily Transportation Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay Sung Campbell

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Adam Segal

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Affidavit of Service

1 #2

Exhibit A-C

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/9/2023) (ks) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Sung Campbell on behalf of Mona Misra..( Campbell, Jay) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#5

(#5) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel is directed to call the courts telephone conference line atthe scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442, Conference ID: 164 626 371#. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis on 3/21/2023) (tg) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel is directed to call the courts telephone conference line atthe scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442, Conference ID: 164 626 371#. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis on 3/21/2023) (tg) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Sung Campbell on behalf of Mona Misra..( Campbell, Jay) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/9/2023) (ks) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Adam Segal. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 817740/2022e. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27304459).Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp., Marcus Scott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit A-C).(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less