This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2023 at 10:08:15 (UTC).

Pedigo, Jr. et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 Pedigo, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-22222

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard T. Pedigo, Jr.

Robin M. Pedigo

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithkline, PLC

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Pfizer, Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Acic Pharmaceuticals

Ajanta

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Amneal

ANDA Repository

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Louis Haberman

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Gisel Rosa Schlesinger Law in the amount of $505.00 on 05/03/2023 re 4 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks, (Torres, Betsabel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re #3 Notice of Appeal. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled by attorney in correct case # 20-MD-02924-RLR, DE 6569 . Filing fee refund request has been sent to Financial Department (apz) Modified text on 5/1/2023 (apz). (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appeal by Robin M. Pedigo, Richard T. Pedigo, Jr.. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16566513. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (kpe) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 23-cv-22222-. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (kpe) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT "Short Form Complaint" against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16498598, filed by Robin M. Pedigo, Richard T. Pedigo, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less