This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2023 at 13:04:55 (UTC).

Stoops v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Stoops filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Tolliver Giles and William E. Fitzpatrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01255

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia Tolliver Giles

Referral Judge

William E. Fitzpatrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Stoops

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Damon Robert Miller

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9128633.), filed by Christopher Stoops. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Damon) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Stoops. Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Miller, Damon) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Stoops. Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Miller, Damon) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9128633.), filed by Christopher Stoops. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Damon) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less