This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2023 at 08:49:30 (UTC).

Competitive Access Systems, Inc. v. Oracle Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 Competitive Access Systems, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Oracle Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Competitive Access Systems, Inc.

Defendants

Oracle Corporation

Oracle America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James A. Shimota

Courtney A. Neufeld

Henry Pogorzelski

Patrick Duffy Richards

Nicholas F. Lenning

Defendant Attorneys

Harper S. Batts

Christopher S. Ponder

Deron R Dacus

Jeffrey Liang

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) ORDER Lifting Stay. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#66

(#66) ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Courtney A. Neufeld. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#65

(#65) ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick D. Richards. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#64

(#64) ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Liang. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

62 #1

Proposed Order

#62

(#62) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Courtney A. Neufeld ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17257248) by on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

61 #1

Proposed Order

#61

(#61) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Patrick D. Richards ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17257182) by on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#59

(#59) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Ponder for Jeffrey Liang (PHV Attorney) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17247648) by on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER Lifting Stay. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Courtney A. Neufeld. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick D. Richards. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Liang. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harper S. Batts. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Courtney A. Neufeld ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17257248) by on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Patrick D. Richards ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17257182) by on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc. . Attorney Henry Pogorzelski added to party Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (pty:pla) (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Ponder for Jeffrey Liang (PHV Attorney) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17247648) by on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Ponder for Harper S. Batts (PHV Attorney) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17247619) by on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Oracle America, Inc. served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9040345.), filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less