This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2023 at 12:42:41 (UTC).

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Anobri Pharmaceuticals US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2023 Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Anobri Pharmaceuticals US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William C. Bryson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00715

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C. Bryson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH

Defendants

Anobri Pharmaceuticals US, LLC

NanChang Anovent Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

Shanghai Anovent Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Anthony David Raucci

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-G

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/19/2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/19/2025. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,284,474 B2 ;7,896,264 B2 ;7,396,341 B2 ;9,027,967 B2 ;7,837,235 B2 ;8,733,341 B2. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG. for Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Summons Issued

6 #2

Summons Issued

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2023

DocketCase Reassigned to Judge William C. Bryson of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (WCB) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00715-WCB, 1:23-cv-00716-WCB (rjb) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00715-GBW, 1:23-cv-00716-GBW (rjb) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Anobri Pharmaceuticals US, LLC on 6/30/2023; NanChang Anovent Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 6/30/2023; Shaghai Anovent Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG. for Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,284,474 B2 ;7,896,264 B2 ;7,396,341 B2 ;9,027,967 B2 ;7,837,235 B2 ;8,733,341 B2. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/19/2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/19/2025. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Anobri Pharmaceuticals US, LLC, NanChang Anovent Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Shaghai Anovent Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4170243.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less