This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2023 at 08:33:44 (UTC).

Rapoza v. Aegis Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 Rapoza filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Aegis Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A. Jackson and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01138

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gypsie Rapoza

Defendant

Aegis Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather Charlene Ford

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2628017.), filed by Gypsie Rapoza. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certification Letter)(Ford, Heather) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Attachment Certification Letter

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Gypsie Rapoza identifying Affiliate/Interested Person McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Gypsie Rapoza, Affiliate/Interested Person Law Office of Heather C. Ford, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Aegis Security Insurance Company for Gypsie Rapoza. (Ford, Heather) (Entered: 09/09/2023)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 1/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/25/2023. (KAH) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 1/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/25/2023. (KAH) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Gypsie Rapoza identifying Affiliate/Interested Person McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Gypsie Rapoza, Affiliate/Interested Person Law Office of Heather C. Ford, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Aegis Security Insurance Company for Gypsie Rapoza. (Ford, Heather) (Entered: 09/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (DCB) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2628017.), filed by Gypsie Rapoza. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certification Letter)(Ford, Heather) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less