This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2023 at 08:47:09 (UTC).

JONES et al v. STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2023 JONES filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01634

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHANELL JONES

LYLE HARRIS

Defendant

STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martell Harris

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A. Martini

Kevin D. Huber

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-23-3628 Copies attached: Complaint, Entry of Appearance, Acceptance of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7877495), filed by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service) (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance

1 #4

Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark) Document removed from public view and refiled as an Errata at #4 . Modified text on 9/13/2023. (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Martini on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#4

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark) Document removed from public view and refiled as an Errata at #4 . Modified text on 9/13/2023. (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Huber on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Huber, Kevin) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER remanding case to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. The Clerk shall mark this case as CLOSED. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/14/2023. (pak) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER remanding case to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. The Clerk shall mark this case as CLOSED. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/14/2023. (pak) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Huber on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Huber, Kevin) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (kss) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Errata re #2 Disclosure Statement, by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: CORRECTING DEFENDANT'S NAME IN CAPTION. (Martini, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Caption of document does not match caption of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption (Defendant). (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Martini on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark) Document removed from public view and refiled as an Errata at #4 . Modified text on 9/13/2023. (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 9/19/2023. (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-23-3628 Copies attached: Complaint, Entry of Appearance, Acceptance of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7877495), filed by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service) (kss) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less