2:23-CV-03530
06/29/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Claire C. Cecchi
Michael A. Hammer
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH
ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC
NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
WILLIAM C. BATON
CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
(#1) COMPLAINT against ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC, NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14425539), filed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)
(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC, NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
(#4) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mxw) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
Complaint
(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC waiver sent on 6/30/2023, answer due 8/29/2023. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC waiver sent on 6/30/2023, answer due 8/29/2023. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mxw) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC, NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANOBRI PHARMACEUTICALS US, LLC, NANCHANG ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., SHANGHAI ANOVENT PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14425539), filed by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/29/2023)
[-] Read Less