This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2023 at 07:44:11 (UTC).

Maldonado et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 Maldonado filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02773

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Maldonado

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Abbott Laboratories Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brenden P. Leydon

Defendant Attorneys

Meir Feder

John J. Robinson

Kelcie Burns Reid

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#19

(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#18

(#18) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

(#17) RECEIVED from Connecticut; Case Number 3:23-cv-00509 (nsf,) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#16

(#16) MDL Conditional Transfer Order. Case transferred to the NorthernDistrict of Illinois. (signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 5/3/2023. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 19, 2023 to file a Responsive Pleading by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Reid, Kelcie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#12

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#9

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#7

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#6

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#5

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#4

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#3

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#2

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RECEIVED from Connecticut; Case Number 3:23-cv-00509 (nsf,) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MDL Conditional Transfer Order. Case transferred to the NorthernDistrict of Illinois. (signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 5/3/2023. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to 5/19/2023. (Reis, Julia) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until May 19, 2023 to file a Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/25/2023. (Guerrier, C.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 19, 2023 to file a Responsive Pleading by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Reid, Kelcie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #6 Notice of Related Case filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #9 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #12 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketJudge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Docket(#8) Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023.(Perez, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelcie Burns Reid on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Reid, Kelcie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. of Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Pending Motions (Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Laboratories from Judicial District of Stamford/Norwalk at Stamford, case number FST-CV23-6060567-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7321586, filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/3/2023.] (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less