This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2023 at 08:03:49 (UTC).

Redwood Technologies, LLC v. Texas Instruments Incorporated

Case Summary

On 03/29/2023 Redwood Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Texas Instruments Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Redwood Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Texas Instruments Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick Joseph Conroy

John Paul Murphy

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Thomas William Kennedy, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Amanda Aline Abraham

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Texas Instruments Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9427714.), filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Incorporated Registered Agent CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Monument IP Fund 2, LLC for Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Murphy, John) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. Texas Instruments Incorporated served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments Incorporated.(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Patrick Joseph Conroy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Patrick Joseph Conroy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Texas Instruments Incorporated to 6/5/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments Incorporated.(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. Texas Instruments Incorporated served on 3/31/2023, answer due 4/21/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Murphy, John) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Monument IP Fund 2, LLC for Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Incorporated Registered Agent CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Texas Instruments Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9427714.), filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less