This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2023 at 07:40:49 (UTC).

El-Amin v. WellPath LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2023 El-Amin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against WellPath LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00824

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wadeedah El-Amin

Defendants

Wellpath LLC

Correct Care Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Austin W. Anderson

Michael A. Josephson

Carter Tilden Hastings

Cliff Alexander

Sue L. Robinson

Andrew W. Dunlap

Brian E. Farnan

Carl A. Fitz

Michael J. Farnan

Charles P. Yezbak, III

Melody Fowler-Green

N. Chase Teeples

William Clifton Alexander

Defendant Attorneys

Keith D. Frazier

Laurence V. Cronin

Darius Walker, Jr.

 

Court Documents

29 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

29 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Clif Alexander

#29

(#29) MOTION for attorney Clif Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3890269) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Clif Alexander, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

28 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#28

(#28) MOTION for attorney Austin W. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3890239) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Austin) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

27 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#27

(#27) MOTION for attorney Carter T. Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3890223) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hastings, Carter) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

26 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#26

(#26) MOTION for attorney Carl A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3888636) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Teeples, N.) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

24 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carl A. Fitz, filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2023. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#5

SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Josephson and Andrew W. Dunlap, filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/31/2023. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wadeedah El-Amin.WellPath LLC served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to WellPath LLC on 5/24/2023. (jfm) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/24/2023)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against WellPath LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4143484.) - filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/24/2023)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) ORDER granting #26 , #27 , #28 , and #29 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Carl A. Fitz, Carter T. Hastings, Austin W. Anderson, and Clif Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/28/2023. (lh) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) MOTION for attorney Clif Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3890269) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Clif Alexander, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) MOTION for attorney Austin W. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3890239) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Austin) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) MOTION for attorney Carter T. Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3890223) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hastings, Carter) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

Docket***DISREGARD/DUPLICATE***TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles P. Yezbak, III, Melody Fowler-Green admitted to this court. (ad) Modified on 8/17/2023 (ad). (Entered: 08/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for N. Chase Teeples, Charles P. Yezbak, III, Melody Fowler-Green admitted to this court. (ad) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) MOTION for attorney Carl A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3888636) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Teeples, N.) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Michael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/15/2023. (lh) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) MOTION for attorney Michael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3887078) by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Melody Fowler-Green on behalf of Wadeedah El-Amin (Fowler-Green, Melody) (Entered: 08/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carl A. Fitz, filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2023. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carl A. Fitz - filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap and Michael A. Josephson for Wadeedah El-Amin added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Josephson and Andrew W. Dunlap, filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/31/2023. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Josephson and Andrew W. Dunlap - filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wadeedah El-Amin.WellPath LLC served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to WellPath LLC on 5/24/2023. (jfm) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against WellPath LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4143484.) - filed by Wadeedah El-Amin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/8/2023.] (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less