This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:51:55 (UTC).

Sheff v. Jefferds Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Sheff filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Jefferds Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:23-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard J. Sheff

Defendants

Jefferds Corporation doing business as Homestead Materials Handling Company

Crown Equipment Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Wayne Broughton

Evans Greenwood Edwards

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie Gacek Cook

Nicholas Ryan Martinez

Joseph Anthony Piasta

Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr.

Ryan Matthew Cullen

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr on behalf of Crown Equipment Corporation (Cullen, Thomas)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Cullen on behalf of Crown Equipment Corporation (Cullen, Ryan)

#30

(#30) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/21/2024-10/25/2024 09:00 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/20/2023. (ams)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Crown Equipment Corporation.(Piasta, Joseph)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferds Corporation.(Cook, Stephanie)

#25

(#25) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss . filed by Jefferds Corporation. (Cook, Stephanie)

#24

(#24) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Jefferds Corporation. (Cook, Stephanie)

#22

(#26) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferds Corporation.(Cook, Stephanie)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Crown Equipment Corporation.(Piasta, Joseph)

#6

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry [CL23-1010] State Court Record #6 . State Court Answer located page# 94 by C&B Material Handling, LLC, Thomas Hutchens, Jefferds Corporation. (sln) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#5

(#5) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Equipment Corporation (Brydges, Brian)

#4

(#4) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 05/26/2023. (sln)

1 #5

Exhibit F: State Court Process

1 #4

Exhibit E: State Court Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit D: C&B Annual Report

1 #2

Exhibit B&C: Crown Corp. Docs

1 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr on behalf of Crown Equipment Corporation (Cullen, Thomas)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Cullen on behalf of Crown Equipment Corporation (Cullen, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/21/2024-10/25/2024 09:00 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/20/2023. (ams)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for October 21 - 25, 2024 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (mc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • Docket(#28) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/14/2023. (kpa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Crown Equipment Corporation.(Piasta, Joseph)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferds Corporation.(Cook, Stephanie)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss . filed by Jefferds Corporation. (Cook, Stephanie)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Jefferds Corporation. (Cook, Stephanie)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Docket(#23) ORAL ORDER vacating the Show Cause Order (Dkt. No. 20) as the issue is moot with the filing of the Amended Complaint. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on June 27, 2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&B Material Handling, LLC (Cook, Stephanie)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferds Corporation (Cook, Stephanie)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Crown Equipment Corporation.(Piasta, Joseph)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry [CL23-1010] State Court Record #6 . State Court Answer located page# 94 by C&B Material Handling, LLC, Thomas Hutchens, Jefferds Corporation. (sln) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified True Copies of State Court Record(s) received electronically from Roanoke City Circuit Court, case number(s) CL23-1010. (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Equipment Corporation (Brydges, Brian)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 05/26/2023. (sln)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Requirement - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sln)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roanoke City Circuit Court, case number CL23001010-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, receipt number AVAWDC-4193316), filed by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B&C: Crown Corp. Docs, #3 Exhibit D: C&B Annual Report, #4 Exhibit E: State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit F: State Court Process)(sln) (Attachment 2 replaced, rotated pages to view upright on 6/6/2023) (sln).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less