This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2023 at 08:11:03 (UTC).

In Re: Golden Seahorse LLC

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 In Re Golden Seahorse LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis A. Kaplan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-07868

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis A. Kaplan

 

Party Details

In Re, Debtor and Appellant

Golden Seahorse LLC doing business as Holiday Inn Manhattan Financial District

Appellee

Wilmington Trust, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Scott Samuel Markowitz

Appellee Attorney

Gary Frederick Eisenberg

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Philip Bentley dated August 17, 2023. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 22-B-11582 (PB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Golden Seahorse LLC..(bkar) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Golden Seahorse LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Certification Order).(Markowitz, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Copy of Certification Order

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING OR OTHERWISE TOLLING THE TIME TO PERFECT THE APPEAL AS PROVIDED IN THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 8009 THROUGH 8018 PENDING THE COURT OF APPEALS' DETERMINATION ON WHETHER TO ACCEPT A DIRECT APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2). IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY AND BETWEEN THE APPELLANT AND THE APPELLEE AS FOLLOWS: The time deadlines set forth in Federal Rules Bankruptcy Procedures 8009-8018 are hereby tolled pending the Second Circuit's determination on the request to accept the direct appeal. In the event the Second Circuit declines to accept the direct appeal, the time frames contained in Federal Rules Bankruptcy Procedure 8009-8018, subject to any adjustments approved by this Court, shall then apply. For avoidance of doubt, the time frames set forth in the Federal Rule Bankruptcy Procedure 8009 shall commence the first business day after the Second Circuit declines to accept the direct appeal such that (a) Appellant shall file the designation of items to be included on the record of the appeal and a statement of the issues presented within 14 days after the Court of Appeals' order declining a direct appeal, and (b) all other subsequent deadlines set forth in Bankruptcy Rule 8009 shall thereafter apply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/29/23) (yv) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#5

(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF THE BANKRUPTCY COURT CONCERNING THE PARTIES JOINT CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 158(D)(2)(A). Signed by Honorable Philip Bentley, United States Bankruptcy Judge - on October 2, 2023. (laq) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF THE BANKRUPTCY COURT CONCERNING THE PARTIES JOINT CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 158(D)(2)(A). Signed by Honorable Philip Bentley, United States Bankruptcy Judge - on October 2, 2023. (laq) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING OR OTHERWISE TOLLING THE TIME TO PERFECT THE APPEAL AS PROVIDED IN THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 8009 THROUGH 8018 PENDING THE COURT OF APPEALS' DETERMINATION ON WHETHER TO ACCEPT A DIRECT APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2). IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY AND BETWEEN THE APPELLANT AND THE APPELLEE AS FOLLOWS: The time deadlines set forth in Federal Rules Bankruptcy Procedures 8009-8018 are hereby tolled pending the Second Circuit's determination on the request to accept the direct appeal. In the event the Second Circuit declines to accept the direct appeal, the time frames contained in Federal Rules Bankruptcy Procedure 8009-8018, subject to any adjustments approved by this Court, shall then apply. For avoidance of doubt, the time frames set forth in the Federal Rule Bankruptcy Procedure 8009 shall commence the first business day after the Second Circuit declines to accept the direct appeal such that (a) Appellant shall file the designation of items to be included on the record of the appeal and a statement of the issues presented within 14 days after the Court of Appeals' order declining a direct appeal, and (b) all other subsequent deadlines set forth in Bankruptcy Rule 8009 shall thereafter apply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/29/23) (yv) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Golden Seahorse LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Certification Order).(Markowitz, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Philip Bentley dated August 17, 2023. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 22-B-11582 (PB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Golden Seahorse LLC..(bkar) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less