This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2023 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

Murillo v. CRST Expedited, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 Murillo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRST Expedited, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03473

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bertulfo Murillo

Defendants

CRST Expedited, Inc.

James K. Edouard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel L. Levine

Scott Lawrence Wiss

Jeremy David Wiss

Martin M Howfield

Defendant Attorneys

Sharon Beth Kaufman-Moreland

Lorne M. Reiter

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Proposed Scheduling Order submitted on consent by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Beth Kaufman-Moreland on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (aty to be noticed) (Kaufman-Moreland, Sharon) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Lorne M. Reiter on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (notification declined or already on case) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the parties' consent filed at #16 , an in-person Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/6/2023 at 4:20 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 6/20/2023. Plaintiff is directed to serve on Defendants a complete set of medical releases and HIPAA authorizations prior to the conference per the 5/10/2023 Order, if not yet done. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/1/2023. (MG) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (RG) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard. (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

14 #1

Affidavit of Service

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

13 #1

Affidavit of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. Levine on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Joel) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (notification declined or already on case) (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (notification declined or already on case) (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard civil cover sheet (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C - response to demand for ad damnum

1 #2

Exhibit B - demand for ad damnum

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 509027/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16679196) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - demand for ad damnum, #3 Exhibit C - response to demand for ad damnum, #4 Certificate of Service) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon: Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/6/2023. Jeremy David Wiss appearing for Plaintiff. Sharon Beth Kaufman-Moreland appearing for Defendants. (FTR Log #4:18-4:33.) (MG) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Proposed Scheduling Order submitted on consent by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Beth Kaufman-Moreland on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (aty to be noticed) (Kaufman-Moreland, Sharon) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Lorne M. Reiter on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (notification declined or already on case) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the parties' consent filed at #16 , an in-person Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/6/2023 at 4:20 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 6/20/2023. Plaintiff is directed to serve on Defendants a complete set of medical releases and HIPAA authorizations prior to the conference per the 5/10/2023 Order, if not yet done. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/1/2023. (MG) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (RG) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard. (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin M Howfield on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (aty to be noticed) (Howfield, Martin) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Wiss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Wiss, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Cover Sheet.. by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bertulfo Murillo (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. Levine on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Joel) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (notification declined or already on case) (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Bertulfo Murillo (notification declined or already on case) (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SR) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard civil cover sheet (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRST Expedited, Inc., James K. Edouard from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 509027/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16679196) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - demand for ad damnum, #3 Exhibit C - response to demand for ad damnum, #4 Certificate of Service) (Reiter, Lorne) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less