This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2023 at 09:06:04 (UTC).

Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy L. Maldonado. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03447

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy L. Maldonado

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STATUS Report by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#22

RESTRICTED

21 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2

21 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1

#21

(#21) AMENDED complaint by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 . For the reasons provided in its motion, Plaintiff may file under seal its Schedule A identifying the list of Defendants and screenshots showing the Defendants' internet stores in Exhibit 3 of the Declaration of Sean Gorman. The Court also grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages #9 . Plaintiff may file its motion for a temporary restraining order that does not exceed 31-pages. Before the Court can rule on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #10 , the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a brief addressing the propriety of joinder of all defendants on or before 7/12/2023. See Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. P'ships and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020); Art Ask Agency v. Individuals, Corps., Ltd. Liab. Cos., P'ships, and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule "A," 21-CV-06197, 2021 WL 5493226 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 23, 2021). Plaintiff's brief must refer to specific facts alleged in this case. For example, Plaintiff shall provide citations to specific screenshots associated with specified Schedule A defendants to demonstrate that joinder is proper. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#19

(#19) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#10

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 . For the reasons provided in its motion, Plaintiff may file under seal its Schedule A identifying the list of Defendants and screenshots showing the Defendants' internet stores in Exhibit 3 of the Declaration of Sean Gorman. The Court also grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages #9 . Plaintiff may file its motion for a temporary restraining order that does not exceed 31-pages. Before the Court can rule on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #10 , the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a brief addressing the propriety of joinder of all defendants on or before 7/12/2023. See Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. P'ships and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020); Art Ask Agency v. Individuals, Corps., Ltd. Liab. Cos., P'ships, and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule "A," 21-CV-06197, 2021 WL 5493226 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 23, 2021). Plaintiff's brief must refer to specific facts alleged in this case. For example, Plaintiff shall provide citations to specific screenshots associated with specified Schedule A defendants to demonstrate that joinder is proper. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#9

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 . For the reasons provided in its motion, Plaintiff may file under seal its Schedule A identifying the list of Defendants and screenshots showing the Defendants' internet stores in Exhibit 3 of the Declaration of Sean Gorman. The Court also grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages #9 . Plaintiff may file its motion for a temporary restraining order that does not exceed 31-pages. Before the Court can rule on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #10 , the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a brief addressing the propriety of joinder of all defendants on or before 7/12/2023. See Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. P'ships and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020); Art Ask Agency v. Individuals, Corps., Ltd. Liab. Cos., P'ships, and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule "A," 21-CV-06197, 2021 WL 5493226 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 23, 2021). Plaintiff's brief must refer to specific facts alleged in this case. For example, Plaintiff shall provide citations to specific screenshots associated with specified Schedule A defendants to demonstrate that joinder is proper. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#6

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 . For the reasons provided in its motion, Plaintiff may file under seal its Schedule A identifying the list of Defendants and screenshots showing the Defendants' internet stores in Exhibit 3 of the Declaration of Sean Gorman. The Court also grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages #9 . Plaintiff may file its motion for a temporary restraining order that does not exceed 31-pages. Before the Court can rule on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #10 , the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a brief addressing the propriety of joinder of all defendants on or before 7/12/2023. See Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. P'ships and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020); Art Ask Agency v. Individuals, Corps., Ltd. Liab. Cos., P'ships, and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule "A," 21-CV-06197, 2021 WL 5493226 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 23, 2021). Plaintiff's brief must refer to specific facts alleged in this case. For example, Plaintiff shall provide citations to specific screenshots associated with specified Schedule A defendants to demonstrate that joinder is proper. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Part 1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20692516. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATUS Report by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED complaint by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 . For the reasons provided in its motion, Plaintiff may file under seal its Schedule A identifying the list of Defendants and screenshots showing the Defendants' internet stores in Exhibit 3 of the Declaration of Sean Gorman. The Court also grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages #9 . Plaintiff may file its motion for a temporary restraining order that does not exceed 31-pages. Before the Court can rule on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #10 , the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a brief addressing the propriety of joinder of all defendants on or before 7/12/2023. See Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. P'ships and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020); Art Ask Agency v. Individuals, Corps., Ltd. Liab. Cos., P'ships, and Unincorporated Ass'ns Identified on Schedule "A," 21-CV-06197, 2021 WL 5493226 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 23, 2021). Plaintiff's brief must refer to specific facts alleged in this case. For example, Plaintiff shall provide citations to specific screenshots associated with specified Schedule A defendants to demonstrate that joinder is proper. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 7 of Gorman Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 6 of Gorman Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Gorman Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Gorman Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Gorman Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20692516. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less