This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2023 at 09:36:57 (UTC).

Jones v. WalMart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WalMart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-14339

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie Jones

Defendant

WalMart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jess Dennis Jordan

Kyle Christopher Jam Foster-bailey

Michael Patrick McCready

Rogelio Garcia

Stephen Thomas Conway

Defendant Attorneys

James P. Balog

Ariel Terese Flood

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Julie Jones; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21168594. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jordan, Jess) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/13/2023 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Emailed notice (axc). (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jordan, Jess) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Michael Patrick McCready (McCready, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Rogelio Garcia (Garcia, Rogelio) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Jess Dennis Jordan (Jordan, Jess) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Stephen Thomas Conway (Conway, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Kyle Christopher Jam Foster-bailey (Foster-bailey, Kyle) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WalMart, Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WalMart, Inc. by Ariel Terese Flood (Flood, Ariel) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

#11

(#11) JURY Demand (Balog, James) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by WalMart, Inc.(Flood, Ariel) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by WalMart, Inc.(Flood, Ariel) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) JURY Demand (Balog, James) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WalMart, Inc. by Ariel Terese Flood (Flood, Ariel) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WalMart, Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant WalMart, Inc. (mek,) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Kyle Christopher Jam Foster-bailey (Foster-bailey, Kyle) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Stephen Thomas Conway (Conway, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Jess Dennis Jordan (Jordan, Jess) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Rogelio Garcia (Garcia, Rogelio) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Julie Jones by Michael Patrick McCready (McCready, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jordan, Jess) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/13/2023 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Emailed notice (axc). (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, ) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, ) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Julie Jones; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21168594. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jordan, Jess) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less