This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2023 at 08:09:42 (UTC).

Premera Blue Cross v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 Premera Blue Cross filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-11254

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Premera Blue Cross

Defendants

Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited

Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc

Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William J Fidurko

Charles Z Kopel

Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.

RENEE A. NOLAN

URIEL RABINOVITZ

Defendant Attorneys

Fred A. Kelly, Jr.

Joshua S. Barlow

Michael F. Brockmeyer

Ralph E. Labaton

 

Court Documents

34 #4

Appendix B

34 #3

Appendix A-3

34 #2

Appendix A-2

34 #1

Appendix A-1

#34

(#34) MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Premera's Class Action Complaint filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-1, #2 Appendix A-2, #3 Appendix A-3, #4 Appendix B)(Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#33

(#33) MOTION to Dismiss Premera's Class Action Complaint by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc..(Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Joshua S. Barlow (Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

26 #2

Certificate of Ralph E. Labaton

#21

(#29) Opposition re #21 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order No. 1 Coordinating Pretrial Proceedings in Related Actions [Partial] filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Lead Class Counsel for End-Payor Class filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Certification of Basis for Designation of Relatedness by Premera Blue Cross. (Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Premera Blue Cross identifying Corporate Parent Premera for Premera Blue Cross.. (Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

1 #3

Affidavit Venue Affidavit

1 #2

Category Form Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9885585 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form Category Form, #3 Affidavit Venue Affidavit)(Fidurko, William) Modified on 6/2/2023: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 06/02/2023)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Premera's Class Action Complaint filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-1, #2 Appendix A-2, #3 Appendix A-3, #4 Appendix B)(Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) MOTION to Dismiss Premera's Class Action Complaint by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc..(Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Joshua S. Barlow (Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #21 Motion for Order, without prejudice to renew after an Answer is filed. (RGS, law3) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Michael F. Brockmeyer and Ralph E. Labaton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) Opposition re #21 MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order No. 1 Coordinating Pretrial Proceedings in Related Actions [Partial] filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The same leave is granted for plaintiff to file any opposition. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order) - in the caption of the document. (RGS, law1) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Defendants Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Memorandum In Excess Of Twenty Pages by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc..(Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael F. Brockmeyer and Ralph E. Labaton Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-9964999 by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Michael F. Brockmeyer, #2 Certificate of Ralph E. Labaton)(Barlow, Joshua) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 76 Motion re Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. (RGS, law1) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Renee A. Nolan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9901115 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr. Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9901108 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles Kopel Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9901100 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Lead Class Counsel for End-Payor Class filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Lead Class Counsel for End-Payor Class by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Certification of Basis for Designation of Relatedness by Premera Blue Cross. (Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Premera Blue Cross identifying Corporate Parent Premera for Premera Blue Cross.. (Fidurko, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9885585 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form Category Form, #3 Affidavit Venue Affidavit)(Fidurko, William) Modified on 6/2/2023: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less