This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2023 at 08:33:48 (UTC).

Leonard Taylor v. CRST The Transportation Solution Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2023 Leonard Taylor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CRST The Transportation Solution Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00577

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonard Taylor

Defendants

CRST Expedited Inc. Erroneously Sued As CRST The Transportation Solution Inc. doing business as CRST The Transportation Solution Inc.

Does 1 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aarin A Zeif

Michael A Gould

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen Jeannine Nesbit

LaLonnie Villa Gray

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023-01308808-CU-WT-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35054639 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Nesbit in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Emily Taylor in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Complaint) (Attorney LaLonnie Villa Gray added to party CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

1 #1

Declaration of Kristen Nesbit in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal

1 #2

Declaration of Emily Taylor in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal

1 #3

State Court Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Leonard Taylor, and Defendant, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. Related Case(s): none (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#9

(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#11

(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant CRST Expedited Inc... (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#12

(#12) MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2023, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 8/6/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/25/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 11/16/2023. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 1/25/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 5/2/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 5/15/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 7/3/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 7/10/2024. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2023, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 8/6/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/25/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 11/16/2023. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 1/25/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 5/2/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 5/15/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 7/3/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 7/10/2024. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant CRST Expedited Inc... (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant CRST Expedited Inc.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants CRST Expedited Inc., Does. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Leonard Taylor.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/21/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. Related Case(s): none (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Leonard Taylor, and Defendant, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023-01308808-CU-WT-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35054639 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Nesbit in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Emily Taylor in support of Defendant's Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Complaint) (Attorney LaLonnie Villa Gray added to party CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less