This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2023 at 11:27:15 (UTC).

TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 TV Tokyo Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-10715

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TV Tokyo Corporation

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Benjamin Kalbac

Robert Payton Mcmurray

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#32

(#32) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#31

RESTRICTED

30 #1

Exhibit 1

#30

(#30) AMENDED complaint by TV Tokyo Corporation against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

#29

(#29) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case pursuant to IOP 13(f)(2)(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2023. (td, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#28

(#28) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by TV Tokyo Corporation (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by TV Tokyo Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21058151. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) AMENDED complaint by TV Tokyo Corporation against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case pursuant to IOP 13(f)(2)(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2023. (td, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by TV Tokyo Corporation (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 16 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 15 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 14 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 13 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
09/15/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by TV Tokyo Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21058151. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less