This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2023 at 13:27:07 (UTC).

Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC v. First Community Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Community Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Nicholas P. Mizell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC

Defendant

First Community Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniele Stefano Lentini

Defendant Attorney

John A. Unzicker, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION to Conduct Mediation via Zoom Videoconference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 11/14/2023 to edit docket text and event type(JDR). (Entered: 11/13/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF SELECTION of Eric Kleinman as mediator by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

#16

(#16) JOINT Certification as to Rules and Orders by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) (Modified on 10/10/2023, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/09/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniele Stefano Lentini on behalf of Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

#14

(#14) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #10 Complaint by First Community Insurance Company.(Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2023. (WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by First Community Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bankers Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bankers Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Bankers Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bankers Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Bankers International Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Bankers International Financial Corporation, Ltd. for First Community Insurance Company. (Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#5

(#5) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2023. (WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John A. Unzicker, Jr on behalf of First Community Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: John A. Unzicker, Jr. (Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#10

(#10) COMPLAINT against First Community Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Filed in state court on 8/15/2023.)(LNR) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #5

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 joint motion to mediate by videoconference. The court is satisfied with the parties' assurances that mediation by videoconference would be just as likely to resolve this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/14/2023. (JMM) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Joint MOTION to Conduct Mediation via Zoom Videoconference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 11/14/2023 to edit docket text and event type(JDR). (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE OF SELECTION of Eric Kleinman as mediator by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) JOINT Certification as to Rules and Orders by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) (Modified on 10/10/2023, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniele Stefano Lentini on behalf of Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Lentini, Daniele) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #10 Complaint by First Community Insurance Company.(Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

Docket(#13) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (JDR) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2023. (WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by First Community Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bankers Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bankers Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Bankers Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bankers Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Bankers International Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Bankers International Financial Corporation, Ltd. for First Community Insurance Company. (Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#7) NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/9/2023. (WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#6) NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 10/30/2023. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 23744. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/20/2023. (WRW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John A. Unzicker, Jr on behalf of First Community Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: John A. Unzicker, Jr. (Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) COMPLAINT against First Community Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Ruuvs FL Properties, LLC. (Filed in state court on 8/15/2023.)(LNR) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alexander L. Bucelo and Rachel Peraza of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JG) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-00744-JLB-NPM. (JG) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 20th Judicial Circuit, Lee County, case number 23-cv-009537 filed in State Court on 08/15/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21262719 filed by First Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents)(Unzicker, John) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less