This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:36:25 (UTC).

Munoz v. United Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Munoz filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-23549

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Damaso J. Munoz

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Damaso J. Munoz.. Filing fees $ 402.00. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Damaso J. Munoz to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: munozdamaso1@gmail.com (kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#4

(#4) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/15/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS275545. (vt) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to United Automobile Insurance Company. (kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to United Automobile Insurance Company. (kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/15/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS275545. (vt) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Damaso J. Munoz to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: munozdamaso1@gmail.com (kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Damaso J. Munoz.. Filing fees $ 402.00. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less