This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2023 at 07:47:00 (UTC).

Great American Insurance Company v. RITcon, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 Great American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against RITcon, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great American Insurance Company

Defendant

RITcon, LLC doing business as Advanced Contents Recovery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diane Updegraff Montgomery

Robert Tayloe Ross

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company. (jv)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to RITcon, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company. RITcon, LLC served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023.(Montgomery, Diane)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Entry of Default /Request Entry of Default by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Montgomery, Diane)

5 #1

Affidavit

#6

(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RITcon, LLC (jv)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RITcon, LLC (jv)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Entry of Default /Request Entry of Default by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Montgomery, Diane)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company. RITcon, LLC served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023.(Montgomery, Diane)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to RITcon, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company. (jv)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against RITcon, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4186755.), filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(jv)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less