This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2023 at 07:43:17 (UTC).

U S Bank National Association v. Ace American Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ace American Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Mark L Hornsby. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00526

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S Bank National Association

Defendants

Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT

Ace American Insurance Co

Hudson Specialty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Kerth

Defendant Attorneys

Stephan Michael Cooper

Craig R Rygiel

William D Wilson

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting #15 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 5/8/2023. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

15 #1

Proposed order

#15

(#15) JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Ace American Insurance co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT, US Bank National Association. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) Modified filers on 5/8/2023 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 05/05/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Complaint. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

13 #8

Proposed order

13 #7

Exhibit 5

13 #6

Exhibit 4

13 #5

Exhibit 3

13 #4

Exhibit 2

13 #3

Exhibit 1

13 #2

Affidavit

13 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Complaint by Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) Modified filers on 5/1/2023 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM ORDER. Underwriters is allowed until May 12, 2023 to file an amended diversity jurisdiction disclosure statement and set forth with specificity the identity and citizenship of each member of Syndicate 2987 (not just its managing agent). See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/28/2023. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig R Rygiel for Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, and Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/26/2023. (crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

8 #2

Proposed order

8 #1

Certificate of good standing

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal,, sent to Stephan Michael Cooper on behalf of Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/5/2023. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting #15 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 5/8/2023. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Ace American Insurance co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT, US Bank National Association. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) Modified filers on 5/8/2023 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Complaint. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Complaint by Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) Modified filers on 5/1/2023 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM ORDER. Underwriters is allowed until May 12, 2023 to file an amended diversity jurisdiction disclosure statement and set forth with specificity the identity and citizenship of each member of Syndicate 2987 (not just its managing agent). See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/28/2023. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a diversity jurisdiction disclosure statement by May 8, 2023. General instructions are in Doc. #3 . Plaintiff is also referred to Wachovia Bank v. Schmidt, 546 U.S. 303, 126 S. Ct. 941 (2006) regarding the citizenship of national banks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/28/2023. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig R Rygiel for Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, and Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/26/2023. (crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William D Wilson for Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, and Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/26/2023. (crt,Enkey, R) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Craig R. Rygiel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5537182) by All Defendants. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for William David Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5536711) by All Defendants. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Cooper, Stephan) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/24/2023. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. (aty,Cooper, Stephan) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/21/2023. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal,, sent to Stephan Michael Cooper on behalf of Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/5/2023. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Stephan Michael Cooper on behalf of Ace American Insurance Co, Hudson Specialty Insurance Co, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/5/2023. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketCASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Ace American Insurance Company answer due 4/28/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED STATE COURT PETITION against Ace American Insurance Company, Hudson Specialty Insurance Company, Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT filed by U.S. Bank National Association. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 169314 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5534563) filed by Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT, Hudson Specialty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Stephan Michael Cooper added to party Ace American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephan Michael Cooper added to party Hudson Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephan Michael Cooper added to party Underwriters at Lloyds Syndicate 2987BRT(pty:dft))(aty,Cooper, Stephan) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less