This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2023 at 07:54:09 (UTC).

Telemaque v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 Telemaque filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine M. Menendez and John F. Docherty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01274

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aretha Telemaque

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dustin Collen Jones

Zachary Schmoll

Defendant Attorneys

Margarita Gokhberg

Daniel Keenan Ryan

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10257188) filed by Aretha Telemaque. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Dustin) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (KNK) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margarita Gokhberg on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10280383 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/10/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 5/18/2023. (jam) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/10/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10280383 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margarita Gokhberg on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Gokhberg, Margarita) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (KNK) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Kate M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 23-cv-1274 (KMM/JFD).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (KNK) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10257188) filed by Aretha Telemaque. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Dustin) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less