This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2023 at 07:39:45 (UTC).

Mooore v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 Mooore filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick(MDL2197). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-DP-20020

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick(MDL2197)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Mooore

Defendants

DePuy Orthopaedics Inc

DePuy, Inc.

DePuy International Ltd.

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Services

Johnson & Johnson International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew J. Burkavage

Defendant Attorneys

Cha'yra Eddie

Eric M. Friedman

Susan M. Sharko

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12066030. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:10-md-2197. Filed by James Mooore. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to DePuy Inc., #2 Summons Summons to DePuy International, #3 Summons Summons to DePuy Orthopedics, #4 Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson International, #5 Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson Services, #6 Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

1 #1

Summons Summons to DePuy Inc.

1 #2

Summons Summons to DePuy International

1 #3

Summons Summons to DePuy Orthopedics

1 #4

Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson International

1 #5

Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson Services

1 #6

Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (M,CE) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon DePuy Orthopaedics Inc on 7/13/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon DePuy, Inc. on 7/13/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson International on 7/10/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#6

(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson Services on 7/10/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#7

(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson on 7/10/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson on 7/10/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson Services on 7/10/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson International on 7/10/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon DePuy, Inc. on 7/13/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon DePuy Orthopaedics Inc on 7/13/2023, filed on behalf of James Mooore (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (M,CE) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12066030. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:10-md-2197. Filed by James Mooore. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to DePuy Inc., #2 Summons Summons to DePuy International, #3 Summons Summons to DePuy Orthopedics, #4 Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson International, #5 Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson Services, #6 Summons Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Burkavage, Andrew) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less