This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 07:45:16 (UTC).

JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED v. LUPIN LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LUPIN LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley R. Chesler and Jessica S. Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02773

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley R. Chesler

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED

Defendants and Counter Claimants

LUPIN LTD.

LUPIN INC.

LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

WILLIAM C. BATON

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

JAMES S. RICHTER

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Complaint and Exhibits

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD..(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING MATTERS AND GRANTING LUPIN LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS that Lupins application seeking leave to amend its Invalidity Contentions is granted; the above-captioned matter is hereby consolidated with Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. v. Lupin Ltd., Lupin Inc., and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Civil Action No. 22-2773 (SRC)(JSA) for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/22/2022. (sm) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Certificate of Service

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ANSWER to Counterclaim by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING MATTERS AND GRANTING LUPIN LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS that Lupins application seeking leave to amend its Invalidity Contentions is granted; the above-captioned matter is hereby consolidated with Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Ltd. v. Lupin Ltd., Lupin Inc., and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Civil Action No. 22-2773 (SRC)(JSA) for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/22/2022. (sm) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD..(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-13404538) , Related Case Selected, filed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less