This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2023 at 07:47:22 (UTC).

BURNS v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 BURNS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02065

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTNEY BURNS

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

ASTRAZENECA LP

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

In Re

PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL J. PENNOCK

Defendant Attorney

BETH S. ROSE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14240778) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COURTNEY BURNS.(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES (ROSE, BETH) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (ROSE, BETH) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (ROSE, BETH) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES (ROSE, BETH) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 4/12/2023, for MDL 2789 PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II). (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14240778) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COURTNEY BURNS.(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less