3:23-CV-22618
04/05/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability
Robin L. Rosenberg
Billy D Mullins
Boehringer Ingelheim
GlaxoSmithKline
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
Pfizer
L. Perrigo Co.
Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Apotex Corporation
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.
Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Strides Pharma, Inc.
Rite Aid Corporation
Walmart Inc.
Jason W. Earley
Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy D Mullins. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 4/7/2023, response/answer due 6/6/2023. (Earley, Jason) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (nwn) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-22618. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (nwn) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16504956, filed by Billy D Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Earley, Jason) (Entered: 04/05/2023)
[-] Read Less