This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2023 at 10:54:25 (UTC).

Mullins v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 Mullins filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-22618

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Billy D Mullins

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim

GlaxoSmithKline

Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC

Pfizer

L. Perrigo Co.

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Apotex Corporation

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.

Strides Pharma, Inc.

Rite Aid Corporation

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason W. Earley

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2023

Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy D Mullins. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 4/7/2023, response/answer due 6/6/2023. (Earley, Jason) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (nwn) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-22618. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (nwn) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16504956, filed by Billy D Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Earley, Jason) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less