This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 07:36:58 (UTC).

Atwood et al v. United States of America/ United States Postal Service

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Atwood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America/ United States Postal Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey A. Meyer and Robert M. Spector. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00649

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

Referral Judge

Robert M. Spector

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Toni Atwood

Defendant

United States of America/ United States Postal Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas P. Pettinicchi

Jeremy H. D'Amico

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy H. D'Amico on behalf of Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#6

(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2023 Discovery due by 11/18/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2023 Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#8

(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Individually). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Toni Atwood, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Toni Atwood, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#10

(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States of America/ United States Postal Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Pettinicchi* *D'Amico & Pettinicchi, LLC* *465 Straits Turnpike* *Watertown, CT 06795*. (Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States of America/ United States Postal Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Pettinicchi* *D'Amico & Pettinicchi, LLC* *465 Straits Turnpike* *Watertown, CT 06795*. (Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Toni Atwood, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Toni Atwood, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Individually). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2023 Discovery due by 11/18/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2023 Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Docket(#3) Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2023.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy H. D'Amico on behalf of Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7353106.), filed by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less