3:23-CV-00649
05/19/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Jeffrey A. Meyer
Robert M. Spector
Toni Atwood
United States of America/ United States Postal Service
Thomas P. Pettinicchi
Jeremy H. D'Amico
Main Document
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy H. D'Amico on behalf of Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2023 Discovery due by 11/18/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2023 Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
(#4) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#5) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Individually). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Toni Atwood, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Toni Atwood, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States of America/ United States Postal Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Pettinicchi* *D'Amico & Pettinicchi, LLC* *465 Straits Turnpike* *Watertown, CT 06795*. (Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/07/2023)
Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States of America/ United States Postal Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Pettinicchi* *D'Amico & Pettinicchi, LLC* *465 Straits Turnpike* *Watertown, CT 06795*. (Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Toni Atwood, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Toni Atwood, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Individually). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Disclosure Statement 7.1 by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood). (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2023 Discovery due by 11/18/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2023 Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Entered: 05/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2023.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy H. D'Amico on behalf of Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually) (D'Amico, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7353106.), filed by Toni Atwood(Administratrix of the Estate of Arthur Atwood), Toni Atwood(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
[-] Read Less