This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2023 at 07:59:11 (UTC).

SMITH v. ASTRAZENECA LP et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2023 SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ASTRAZENECA LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03717

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVELYN SMITH

Defendants

ASTRAZENECA LP

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC.

MERCK & CO. INC. doing business as MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC.

In Re

PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL A. LONDON

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.,, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14447598) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EVELYN SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LONDON, MICHAEL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/14/2023) (krg, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/14/2023) (krg, ). (Entered: 07/12/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/14/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 7/12/2023, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II). (krg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (krg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet filed by MICHAEL LONDON on 7/12/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (krg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.,, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14447598) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EVELYN SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LONDON, MICHAEL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/14/2023) (krg, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/14/2023) (krg, ). (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less