This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2023 at 15:41:17 (UTC).

Mercis B.V. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 09/21/2023 Mercis B filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against v The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-13959

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercis B.V.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

RALDMOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

Defendant Attorney

Jiyuan Zhang

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 135 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2023)

#38

(#38) AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/14/2023.(rbf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Plaintiff's motion to correct the Preliminary Injunction Order #34 is granted. Enter Amended Preliminary Injuction Order. (rbf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant RALDMOV's motion to dismiss #35 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 12/12/23; reply is due by 1/9/24. Court will rule by mail. (rbf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

35 #3

Exhibit B. Demanding Letter

35 #1

Declaration of Jiyuan Zhang

#35

(#35) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant RALDMOV (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jiyuan Zhang, #2 Exhibit A. Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit B. Demanding Letter)(Zhang, Jiyuan) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

34 #1

Exhibit A

#34

(#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Motion to Correct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mercis B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21118797. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 135 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/14/2023.(rbf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Plaintiff's motion to correct the Preliminary Injunction Order #34 is granted. Enter Amended Preliminary Injuction Order. (rbf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant RALDMOV's motion to dismiss #35 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 12/12/23; reply is due by 1/9/24. Court will rule by mail. (rbf, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant RALDMOV (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jiyuan Zhang, #2 Exhibit A. Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit B. Demanding Letter)(Zhang, Jiyuan) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Motion to Correct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RALDMOV by Jiyuan Zhang (Zhang, Jiyuan) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/25/2023.(rbf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction as to defendant nos. 1-6, 21-61 and 127-144 #27 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. (rbf, ) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercis B.V. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
09/21/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mercis B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21118797. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less