This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2023 at 07:19:06 (UTC).

CARR v. TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 CARR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA CARR

Defendant

TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAM M. SOLL

Defendant Attorneys

BROOKS FOLAND

ALLISON LOUISE KRUPP

 

Court Documents

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travelers' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by LISA CARR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(SOLL, ADAM) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit PART 1

#5

(#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PART 1, #2 Exhibit)(jaa, ) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Brief

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travelers' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON LOUISE KRUPP on behalf of TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KRUPP, ALLISON) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#2

(#2) Disclosure with Certificate of Service by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16711631), filed by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travelers' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by LISA CARR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)(SOLL, ADAM) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PART 1, #2 Exhibit)(jaa, ) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travelers' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON LOUISE KRUPP on behalf of TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KRUPP, ALLISON) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure with Certificate of Service by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16711631), filed by TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(FOLAND, BROOKS) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less