This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2023 at 09:07:06 (UTC).

CIERI v. AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2023 CIERI filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02410

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY CIERI

KATHERINE CIERI

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BAYER CROPSCIENCE

BLACKMER PUMP CO. individually and d/b/a Blackmer, a Dover Corp. k/n/a Dover Pumps and Process Solutions Segment Inc.,

CARRIER CORPORATION

CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION

CLA-VAL

COPES VULCAN, INC.

CRANE COMPANY

CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC. individually and as successor to and d/b/a Crane Valve Group, Crane Valves, Pacific Valves and Chapman Valve Manufacturing Co

COLUMBIA BOILER CO.

DURIRON COMPANY

ELLIOT TURBO MACHINERY CO, INC.

FMC CORP.

FORT KENT HOLDINGS, INC.

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GEPPERT BROS. INC.

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED MICHAEL PLACITELLA

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

JOHN S. HOWARTH

JAMES P. HADDEN

CATHERINE N. JASONS

TIFFANY GIANGIULIO

Hillary Cullen Rankin

TIFFANY F. TURNER

G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.

JOSEPH PATRICK REILLY

TRACEY MCDEVITT HAGAN

LINDSEY E. LUNNEY

SUSAN M. VALINIS

JOHN P. MCSHEA

PAMELA A. MAGINNIS

Other Attorneys

DAVID C. WEINBERG

JOSEPH I FONTAK

THERESA M. MULLANEY

GREGORY M. STOKES

JOSHUA D. SCHEETS

TIMOTHY D. RAU

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#65

(#65) ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSS CLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by BAYER CROPSCIENCE(as corporate Successor to Amchem Products, Inc. and Benjamin Foster Co.,).(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#64

(#64) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC with Certificate of Service by CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#63

(#63) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

#62

(#62) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

61 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff Anthony Cieri Deposition

#61

(#61) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KATHERINE CIERI, ANTHONY CIERI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Anthony Cieri Deposition)(PLACITELLA, JARED) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

#60

(#60) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#59

(#59) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ELLIOT TURBO MACHINERY CO, INC..(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#9

(#62) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#4) NOTICE by AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Joinder of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HOWARTH, JOHN) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#65) ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSS CLAIMS AND ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by BAYER CROPSCIENCE(as corporate Successor to Amchem Products, Inc. and Benjamin Foster Co.,).(JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#64) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC with Certificate of Service by CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#63) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#62) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#61) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KATHERINE CIERI, ANTHONY CIERI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Anthony Cieri Deposition)(PLACITELLA, JARED) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#60) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#59) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ELLIOT TURBO MACHINERY CO, INC..(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#58) NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Cullen Rankin on behalf of ELLIOT TURBO MACHINERY CO, INC. with Certificate of Service(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#57) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO TO HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/27/23. 7/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#56) Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.Certificate of Service.(SCHEETS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Joinder in Defendant, John Crane, Inc's Notice of Removal filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. Certificate of Service.(LUNNEY, LINDSEY) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/29/2023) (mbh). (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA M. MULLANEY on behalf of PATTERSON PUMP CO. (MULLANEY, THERESA) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE by AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Joinder of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(HOWARTH, JOHN) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of BLACKMER PUMP CO. (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file a Completed designation form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. (afm) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group PLC by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16770919), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less