This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2023 at 10:26:47 (UTC).

VURIMINDI v. MORGAN et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2023 VURIMINDI filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against MORGAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are KAI N. SCOTT and LYNNE A. SITARSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03282

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAI N. SCOTT

Referral Judge

LYNNE A. SITARSKI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI

Respondents

ERIN MORGAN

PHILADELPHIA ADULT PROBATION AND PAROLE DEPARTMENT

COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY

COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, PHILADELPHIA

MUNICIPAL COURT OF PHILADELPHIA

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 72.1.IV(C) ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 10/17/23. 10/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

8 #10

Cover Sheet

8 #9

Exhibit 8

8 #8

Exhibit 7

8 #7

Exhibit 6

8 #6

Exhibit 5

8 #5

Exhibit 4

8 #4

Exhibit 3

8 #3

Exhibit 2

8 #2

Exhibit 1

8 #1

Memorandum

#8

(#8) Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against ERIN MORGAN, ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, filed by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI.(va) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2023: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Cover Sheet) (va). (Entered: 10/16/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO FURNSIH VURIMINDI WITH THE STANDARD 2254 FORM. IF VURIMINDI PLANS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER, HE SHALL COMPLETE THE FORM AND RETURN IT WITHIN 30 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 9/21/23. 9/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#6

(#6) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20012609 (rf, ) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

5 #1

Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT 2 by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(va) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

4 #1

Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 72.1.IV(C) ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 10/17/23. 10/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against ERIN MORGAN, ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, filed by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI.(va) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2023: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Cover Sheet) (va). (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

Docket2254 Form E-mailed to Pro Se. (va) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO FURNSIH VURIMINDI WITH THE STANDARD 2254 FORM. IF VURIMINDI PLANS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER, HE SHALL COMPLETE THE FORM AND RETURN IT WITHIN 30 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 9/21/23. 9/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20012609 (rf, ) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) EXHIBIT 2 by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(va) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) EXHIBIT 1 by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(va) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(va) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (fdc) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by VAMSIDHAR VURIMINDI. *IFP NOT FILED; FILING FEE NOT PAID* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(fdc) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less