This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2023 at 09:22:38 (UTC).

Walker v. Burlington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 Walker filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Burlington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-05083

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dwight Walker

Defendant

Burlington Insurance Company

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Joseph Sipos, Jr.

Tanner Mitchell Choate

Bradley Justin Egenberg

Daniel E. Levy

Alexandria Claire Walker

Ben Berman

Danielle Mackie

Defendant Attorneys

Kristopher T. Wilson

Shaundra Marie Schudmak

James R. Guidry

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

 

Court Documents

11 #7

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

11 #6

Exhibit

11 #5

Exhibit

11 #4

Exhibit

11 #3

Exhibit

11 #2

Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts

11 #1

Memorandum in Support

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment by Burlington Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Notice of Submission)(Schudmak, Shaundra) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

#10

(#10) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

#9

(#9) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

8 #11

Exhibit A - Part 11

8 #10

Exhibit A - Part 10

8 #7

Exhibit A - Part 7

8 #6

Exhibit A - Part 6

8 #5

Exhibit A - Part 5

8 #4

Exhibit A - Part 4

8 #1

Exhibit A - Part 1

#8

(#8) Notice of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6, #7 Exhibit A - Part 7, #8 Exhibit A - Part 8, #9 Exhibit A - Part 9, #10 Exhibit A - Part 10, #11 Exhibit A - Part 11, #12 Exhibit A - Part 12, #13 Exhibit B)(Guidry, James) Modified on 9/21/2023 (am). (Entered: 09/20/2023)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment by Burlington Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Notice of Submission)(Schudmak, Shaundra) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6, #7 Exhibit A - Part 7, #8 Exhibit A - Part 8, #9 Exhibit A - Part 9, #10 Exhibit A - Part 10, #11 Exhibit A - Part 11, #12 Exhibit A - Part 12, #13 Exhibit B)(Guidry, James) Modified on 9/21/2023 (am). (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Burlington Insurance Company. Answer due date EXTENDED through October 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/7/2023. (sa) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022. (sa) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Burlington Insurance Company. Issued by Clerk. (sa) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guidry, James) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketFiling fee received from James R. Guidry: Receipt No. ALAEDC-10132331 $ 402.00 (mb) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2023-6033 (Fee previously paid) filed by Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-Part 1, #4 Exhibit B-Part 2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D-Part 1, #7 Exhibit D-Part 2, #8 Exhibit D-Part 3, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James R. Guidry added to party Burlington Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Guidry, James) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less