This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2023 at 07:38:07 (UTC).

Shukrullayev v. United Parcel Service Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 Shukrullayev filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against United Parcel Service Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Camille D Bibles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00841

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Camille D Bibles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saifullo Shukrullayev

Defendants

United Parcel Service Incorporated

Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

Mark Hanh Southammavong

Unknown Southammavong

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh

Elizabeth Marie Gonzalez

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21903803 filed by Saifullo Shukrullayev. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (MCO) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21903803. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-841-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER that Saifullo Shukrullayev show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

4 #1

Instructions

4 #2

Consent Form

#5

(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 3 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only),, #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Saifullo Shukrullayev. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Saifullo Shukrullayev. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER that Plaintiff show cause in writing within seven (7) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to respond, this case will be dismissed without further notice. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the Court's Order on 7/5/2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/26/2023. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER: That a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal having been filed, doc. #7 , this case is hereby termed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER that Plaintiff show cause in writing within seven (7) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to respond, this case will be dismissed without further notice. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the Court's Order on 7/5/2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/26/2023. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Saifullo Shukrullayev. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

Docket(#6) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/26/2023. On 5/31/2023, an Order to Show Cause Hearing was set for Plaintiff's failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b). Plaintiff has failed to appear this date. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 9:20 AM to 9:21 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 3 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only),, #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Saifullo Shukrullayev. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER that Saifullo Shukrullayev show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Saifullo Shukrullayev. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: PLEASE file Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21903803. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-841-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21903803 filed by Saifullo Shukrullayev. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (MCO) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less