This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2023 at 15:39:48 (UTC).

Hughes v. Gamestop Corp.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2023 Hughes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gamestop Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Calabretta and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02086

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel J. Calabretta

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamie Hughes

Defendant

Gamestop Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Lawrence Bowen

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra M. Asterlin

George James Theofanis

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 11/21/23 ORDERING that if the Court enters an order denying Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; the parties shall meet and confer as required under Rule 26(f) within 30 days after entry of such order. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for (Joint) Cont. Rule 26(f) Conference by Gamestop Corp.. (Theofanis, George) (Entered: 11/21/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of MOTION by Gamestop Corp. re #4 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration .. (Theofanis, George) Modified on 11/16/2023 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 11/07/2023)

4 #4

Proposed Order

4 #3

Declaration of George Theofanis

4 #2

Declaration of Robin Lewis

4 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#4

(#4) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by Gamestop Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Robin Lewis, #3 Declaration of George Theofanis, #4 Proposed Order)(Theofanis, George) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE 28 US 1446(d) by Gamestop Corp. (Theofanis, George) Modified on 10/4/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 09/27/2023)

2 #3

VDRP

2 #2

Consent Form

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

1 #6

Proof of Service of Removal Docs

1 #4

Declaration of Heather Toro

1 #3

Declaration of George A. Theofanis

1 #2

Statement Corporate Disclosure

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0050959 by Gamestop Corp. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11092826) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement Corporate Disclosure, #3 Declaration of George A. Theofanis, #4 Declaration of Heather Toro, #5 Declaration of Mark H. Robinson, #6 Proof of Service of Removal Docs)(Theofanis, George) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 11/21/23 ORDERING that if the Court enters an order denying Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; the parties shall meet and confer as required under Rule 26(f) within 30 days after entry of such order. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 11/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for (Joint) Cont. Rule 26(f) Conference by Gamestop Corp.. (Theofanis, George) (Entered: 11/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of MOTION by Gamestop Corp. re #4 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration .. (Theofanis, George) Modified on 11/16/2023 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by Gamestop Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Robin Lewis, #3 Declaration of George Theofanis, #4 Proposed Order)(Theofanis, George) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE 28 US 1446(d) by Gamestop Corp. (Theofanis, George) Modified on 10/4/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0050959 by Gamestop Corp. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11092826) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement Corporate Disclosure, #3 Declaration of George A. Theofanis, #4 Declaration of Heather Toro, #5 Declaration of Mark H. Robinson, #6 Proof of Service of Removal Docs)(Theofanis, George) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less