This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2023 at 08:12:19 (UTC).

Matheus Lumber Company, Inc. v. AG Drywall, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 Matheus Lumber Company, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AG Drywall, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ewing Werlein, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-02002

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matheus Lumber Company, Inc.

Defendants

AG Drywall, Inc.

Jordan Foster Construction, LLC

KATY2651, LLC

Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Gayle Vest

Defendant Attorney

Robert Carson Fisk

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., and Liberty Mutual Group Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#18

(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jordan Foster Construction, LLC identifying Franklin Mountain JFC, L.L.C. and Woody Family Investments, L.P. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by KATY2651, LLC, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jordan Foster Construction, LLC, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Jordan, Katy2651, Everson, and Liberty are each granted a two-week extension for such party to file its respective original answer, calculated from the date that each party's respective answer would otherwise be due. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines for Filing Answers by Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC, Jordan Foster Construction, LLC, KATY2651, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matheus Lumber Company, Inc., filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29998984) filed by Matheus Lumber Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., and Liberty Mutual Group Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jordan Foster Construction, LLC identifying Franklin Mountain JFC, L.L.C. and Woody Family Investments, L.P. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by KATY2651, LLC, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jordan Foster Construction, LLC, filed.(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Jordan, Katy2651, Everson, and Liberty are each granted a two-week extension for such party to file its respective original answer, calculated from the date that each party's respective answer would otherwise be due. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines for Filing Answers by Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC, Jordan Foster Construction, LLC, KATY2651, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisk, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matheus Lumber Company, Inc., filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC, filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/29/2023 at 02:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(RebeccaBecknal, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Everson Luxury Apartments, LLC, filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to KATY2651, LLC, filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jordan Foster Construction, LLC, filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to AG Drywall, Inc., filed.(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29998984) filed by Matheus Lumber Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vest, Melissa) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less