This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 13:40:24 (UTC).

Nsewo v. Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Nsewo filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wilmington Trust, N A , Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George C Hanks, Jr and Andrew M Edison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-03452

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

Referral Judge

Andrew M Edison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MFON NSEWO

Defendant

Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas C Barron

Defendant Attorney

George Colby Scherer

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from FORT BEND DISTRICT COURT, case number 23-DCV-306564 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30510100) filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1.(Scherer, George) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/3/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Residential Mortgage Cases.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2023. (Scherer, George) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER Striking Document re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

#7

(#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed.(Scherer, George) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed.(Scherer, George) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed.(Scherer, George) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed.(Scherer, George) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketThe above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER Striking Document re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2023. (Scherer, George) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Residential Mortgage Cases.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ByronThomas, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/3/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from FORT BEND DISTRICT COURT, case number 23-DCV-306564 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30510100) filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity,but solely as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1.(Scherer, George) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less