This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2023 at 09:15:07 (UTC).

Grumpy Cat Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 Grumpy Cat Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02560

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grumpy Cat Limited

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

guocale_50

huanjiay0

Hong Kong Gaoguang Technology

Shenzhenshi Laoshuwangluokeji Youxiangongsi

Humengmeng25536

nnnjkkl

VSPINK Phone accessories

world design phone accessories

Anazonn

ARUU-ZAT

BANOBAGI VITA LLC

BestDuong Shop

BestThao Shop

Bodensee Online

BRKYZTBK Store

CS-Xstore

Dang anh tuan

Di Lynn

226 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Hierl

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 156 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 108 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 119 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#35

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 156 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 108 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 119 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: YJH-050, autopurpularget Co.ltd, DancingRoom, danduodaobao55, Esst shop, FoShanShiChanChengQuWeiQiShangMaoYouXianGongSi, hefeininmiandianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, HEFEISUONAI, HUAINANSHIFANCUNSHANGMAOYOUXIANGONGSI, Inleife, Jiu Jiang Ran Da Shang Mao Co.ltd, K-King Seller Co. ltd, liudongkejiyouxiangongsi, LIXIN TECH, LueInJoy, lulshou, Mengduolai, Muba shop, Patioaro, PAXLYH, QING SUN CO.,LIMITED, Qiqihaerdongrangshangmaoyouxiangongsi, Rgcbnm Co.Ltd, ruiqiershangmaoltd, SHEN ZHEN SHI GE BO DUO DIAN ZI SHANG WU YOU XIAN GONG SI, SHEN ZHEN SHI YOU LI NUO WAN JU YOU XIAN GONG SI, Stapiowal, TaiY, thinsont, tmosphere, weifangchengkaishangmaoyouxiangongsi, Weilaicheng, wenyingqipei Co.ltd, Wiueurtly, WodoFoxo, WRK Fashion Co. ltd, wuhanhuaxinshangmaoyouxiangongsi, WWNER, xiangchengshiwanchuanwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, xianjiedushangmaoltd, XMXY Co.,Ltd, YiTOP Co. Ltd, yubikelmi Co.Ltd and zhongwenmaoyi added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: zichaosyehbs, Kunming Suici Trading Co., Ltd., Li Shuyou, Golden chess e-commerce store, charle Store, dafu10 Store, diao06 Store, dou08 Store, fengyiyi Store, garden2010 Store, hai09 Store, landong08 Store, liancheng07 Store, lianwu04 Store, mang06 Store, shawl Store, soeasyshopping Store, 91140100MA0LT7WW9A, 91140105MA0LRRXG83, 91140105MA0LRT408U, 91460000MABYRGYU07, 91510107MABNUQ053G, 91530102MAC1AR6U1N, Enjoy Home Life, Famous2018, jianxi Home tapestry, Painting Art Decor, saike 49, sweetlovely and wangiatjm added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: MTG Mint Card Ltd., MUCHNEE, MYBOO, nguyendinhtuan220389, ningbo landing fangchanyingxiao, P_THU_A201 Store, PeachVn, ProfessCDL, puwei7845858, qiyingshangwu, qujingqilinqunuokuaishangmaoyouxiangongsi, RAUM MUGS, RENZHANGCOMPA, Saeng.khu810, shanxifanfangkejiyouxiangongsi, shanxilimianmiannxikejiyouxiangongsi, simon_lee, SOULZZZ, SugerStore, Sun Mug 92, sweet26, taianhaiyijimaoyiyouxiangongsi, TB Artist, TeeLucky Store, The Oversize, TMUG8 Store, TPprinthouse, TRANHAIHP, TUNG HOANG SHOP, Unique Design Mug Store, VanCloud, vanthuc, wangyanjinpindian, wanxiujing, xihalgd, YANG XUE, yanzhendedian, yiliyasiaimaier, yuanzhouquhuhanjibaihuodian and zhaotongzhaoyangqumingqianyimaopingdian66 added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: BKA GLOBAL, Buerhomie, Carrozzo Home Vintage, Colson Store, Creative Usa, DANH SHOP, Dau Yen Nhi, DST Apparel Co, EAADFADSFASCVD, Ecrtorin, Elizabeth Norton, EONXNGAGY, FAMOORE-SHOP, FayaStore, Funny Girl store, gansushengkeqiangruiruanjiankaifayouxiangongsi1, Gbuzozie, GerberaStore, GIALILI, Gjsjcjsjcjscjjd, guangzhoujieyongmaoyiyouxiangongsi, H2 Decal, hefeipaliangwangokejiyouxiangongsi, HOANGNAMBSTR, HONGTHAISHOP, Huan's Store, huizegongguishangmaoyouxiangongsi8, JTNFCLBAMC, Just for ur life, Kangliphone, Lara McElveen Store, litianchuan, liuranqiso, liusongyangjingpindian, Lv-ming308, Manh doan bitique, Mariella Natali, Mark McKinley Store, MCXDSZX and Mefallenssiah added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Yilgun Yarikkaya LV, yuanzhouquhegengebaihuodian, YunNanMiMen, zhijiangshidanrongshangmaoyouxiangongsi, zzZThiThaoZzz Store, HuaShao LLC, JINANGYF CO.,LTD, Liutianhao Co.,Ltd, mian yang xiao rui ran ke ji you xian gong si, nanjingwuyitianshangmao, Perelan LLC, Senyue Trading co., ltd., shen zhen shi zuo li ke ji you xian gong si, Shenzhenshi Bosite Maoyiyouxiangongsi, Shenzhenshi feilidi Maoyi Youxiangongsi, WeitingyanCo.,Ltd, WESKINKE, Shanghai Oriland Toys Co., Ltd., diyartcorner, hv34tkefi, ingdata_3, reinberry, Wuhanqingzhiyunjiafangyouxiangongsi, euifyesafkf, fengqiao, FuchsiaY, fvnidfuiskja, gaojiale Store, Georist, HuYuHui, iZone, La JMZ, Li Dada, lukebo890410, luoxiufennika, nanshengjun07, nnvhuqupo, qiluyao520, Sea big fish, wangyaru9003, 6th St, accessoryzone, AcousTee, Amrico Nilzia, ANHVANBNN, Anikoe and anqingqiashangmaoyouxiangongsi added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Grumpy Cat Limited (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Grumpy Cat Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20572030. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less