This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2023 at 07:18:53 (UTC).

Price v. Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2023 Price filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Penske Truck Leasing Co L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02687

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barry Price

Defendants

Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.

Jerry Dyer II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William T. Joyner

Defendant Attorneys

Blair Joseph Cash

Anna Beaton

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Jerry Dyer II, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P..(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#12

(#12) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Anna Beaton replacing attorney Donavan Eason. (Beaton, Anna) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 3/15/2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 07/12/2023. (kng) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#10

(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jerry Dyer II, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#9

(#9) Initial Disclosures by Barry Price.(Joyner, William) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave of Absence of Blair J. Cash

#8

(#8) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/17/2023-7/24/2023, 9/25/2023-9/29/2023, 10/10/20203-10/13/2023, 12/20/2023-1/3/2024, by Blair Joseph Cash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave of Absence of Blair J. Cash)(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#7

(#7) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. William T. Joyner replacing attorney Dallas S.F. Oliver. (Joyner, William) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Penske Automotive Group, Inc., Other Affiliate PTL GP, LLC, Other Affiliate MBK USA Commercial Vehicles, Inc., Other Affiliate Penske Trucking Leasing Corporation for Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jerry Dyer II, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Jerry Dyer II.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/22/2023)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit C to Brief - Mail Package to Jerry Dyer

1 #3

Exhibit B to Brief - Accident Report

1 #2

Exhibit A to Brief - State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Brief in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Jerry Dyer II, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P..(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Anna Beaton replacing attorney Donavan Eason. (Beaton, Anna) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 3/15/2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 07/12/2023. (kng) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jerry Dyer II, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Initial Disclosures by Barry Price.(Joyner, William) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/17/2023-7/24/2023, 9/25/2023-9/29/2023, 10/10/20203-10/13/2023, 12/20/2023-1/3/2024, by Blair Joseph Cash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave of Absence of Blair J. Cash)(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. William T. Joyner replacing attorney Dallas S.F. Oliver. (Joyner, William) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Penske Automotive Group, Inc., Other Affiliate PTL GP, LLC, Other Affiliate MBK USA Commercial Vehicles, Inc., Other Affiliate Penske Trucking Leasing Corporation for Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jerry Dyer II, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Jerry Dyer II.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. Discovery ends on 11/20/2023.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. and Jerry Dyer II. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12676862) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Brief - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B to Brief - Accident Report, #4 Exhibit C to Brief - Mail Package to Jerry Dyer, #5 Exhibit D to Brief - Georgia SOS printout of Penske Truck Leasing, #6 Exhibit E to Brief - Alabama SOS printout of Pace USA, Inc., #7 Exhibit F to Brief - Pre-suit Demand, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less