This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:42:54 (UTC).

Swain v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Swain filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00641

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zavyar Swain

Defendant

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen J. Moore

Sarah Jessica Duggan

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly F. Seten

Jack Rigolizzo Wallace

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2316-CV20707, filed by Kimberly F. Seten. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8625531. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Julie Ross)(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court File

1 #3

Exhibit B- Declaration of Julie Ross

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec.1446(d) by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

2 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/2/2023. Signed on 9/18/23 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Kimberly F. Seten on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to randomly reassign this matter for all further proceedings. Signed on 10/3/23 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc..(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kimberly F. Seten on behalf of Defendant Ryder Truck Rental, Inc..(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#11

(#11) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2024. Telephone Conference set for 1/10/2025 at 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2025 01:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 11/2/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) Modified on 11/2/2023 to change pretrial conference time on 1/24 from AM to PM. (Cordell, Annette). (Entered: 11/02/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2024. Telephone Conference set for 1/10/2025 at 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2025 01:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 11/2/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) Modified on 11/2/2023 to change pretrial conference time on 1/24 from AM to PM. (Cordell, Annette). (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kimberly F. Seten on behalf of Defendant Ryder Truck Rental, Inc..(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc..(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition is GRANTED, up to and including October 6, 2023. Signed on 10/3/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

Docket(#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 4:23-00641-CV-W-BP. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to randomly reassign this matter for all further proceedings. Signed on 10/3/23 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Kimberly F. Seten on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/2/2023. Signed on 9/18/23 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec.1446(d) by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2316-CV20707, filed by Kimberly F. Seten. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8625531. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Julie Ross)(Seten, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less