This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 08:38:21 (UTC).

Emoji Company GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Emoji Company GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03188

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emoji Company GmbH

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

AlbertPearce

AmandaStone

BarbaraPapkey

BarryGreen8

butikuti

CodyGlover

DanielDreveskracht

GraceMccann

HeatherSmith

JacobJohnMartinez

JamesClifton

JeremyMiller

JerodLynch

JimmySanford

JocelynAlbee

JodyArias

JulieKnapp

KimDavis

140 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

Michael A. Hierl

William Benjamin Kalbac

Other Attorneys

Michael R. La Porte

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) MOTION by Defendant Chow Sang Sang for leave to file an answer or otherwise plead. (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#36

(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chow Sang Sang by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 38, 43 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 134, 155 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 132, 136 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 126 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#31

(#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emoji Company GmbH as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

RESTRICTED

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) MOTION by Defendant Chow Sang Sang for leave to file an answer or otherwise plead. (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chow Sang Sang by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 38, 43 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 134, 155 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 132, 136 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: tahoeboelat, TerryToler, ThomasBatt, ThomasGoss, Tiyar Needs, TonjiAllen, ToriLarsen, twistedchromes, WaingArt, walleyelimaa, YaelSutton, yanevbikiz, Yunita33, AIZHIYI, Alizay DiY, AMPHEOUS, ATDMEI STORE, bagchic, BDMP, Bevan, Chaoying Shop, Chow Sang Sang, daaodi, Donna68, Dreamlizer-Direct, DYMSUP, Extramon, fanbaopp, GIBA store, Guangdong FUNGENE Technology Co., Ltd, guangzhongzhongfushangmaoyouxiangongsi, guozoubaihuo, hezaomaoyi, homerug, hongyunwu, jiangpeitong, JIAZHIYANG, jjzuo, Juan Juan Art Store, jusaichao123, kunmingquesuishangmaoyouxiangongsi, Laghima jadon, LUONGNV, mengchengxianhuitongshangmaoyouxiangongsi, New Trade, nxipinglvlintaoshangmaoyouxiango, Purpledip, ShanXiShengXinRunShangMaoYouXianGongSi, somepleasure, THANH THANH EMTM SHOP, TUVAN LUONGSH, wantapeach, Xiayans, xibeiipianbei, yidiz, yunnanfushuaidianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, yunnanwenshenjiedianzishangwuyouxiangongsi and zhanfeikeji added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: bodiantem, BrandyDiggs, BruceMarsalis, bummersausage, cafaroolandh, CharlotteShasta, Conyers Yoder, DavidPalenko, designisfun, Disanderra, DongSondles, edalatlutharl, ErickaGardner, EStore, HATTA1976, hocuttjlyeattsh, JacqulinMarinBingham, JeanScott, JordynFletcher, JosephEWest, JOSHUAMBROOKS, kaosmotip, kaptensudawirat, KaylynnCheater, KellyMacDonld, KevinPowell, kitbitart, LarryMcclish, LonnieGabbard, Makjelaz, MatthewKelly, mejapaku, MichaelSmith, nemlikurduapuluhenam, NICKGARASCIA, NitaForty, OlgaVirginia, opobener, prettiugli, RedLine77, RickAmburgy, RobertWegner, RobinNeels, RobMccrary, sherriandersona, SHOPDOIA0, smittynbhaagy, SONJAMCMILLAN, STACYFTORRES and StevenDavidAnderson added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: AlbertPearce, AmandaStone, BarbaraPapkey, BarryGreen8, butikuti, CodyGlover, DanielDreveskracht, GraceMccann, HeatherSmith, JacobJohnMartinez, JamesClifton, JeremyMiller, JerodLynch, JimmySanford, JocelynAlbee, JodyArias, JulieKnapp, KimDavis, KimmiBarker, LeahThompson, MikeCCady, MollieWeisberger, PatriciaPounders, RalphThomas, RebeccaHubbard, RichardDingwall, RichardLandenberg, RobertSandavalArbolida, RobertWells, sepatukembang, TinaClark, HuyHoangstoreCP, Manhdung.Store, ashalmu-54, homemaker_store, obletter-trade, shrijico0, Guangzhou Liujun Trading Company, Jinanruidaohuliangwangyouxiangongsi, Maanshandechudianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, Shandongshengwanjiaxinxikejiyouxiangongsi, Shenzhen Aizuo Technology Innovation, Shenzhen Jienuoyi Trading, Wuhanqingzhiyunjiafangyouxiangongsi, Anam, AniyahGordon, Artcasess, asatya, baztartartwork and BethJustina added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 126 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emoji Company GmbH as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
05/22/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (evw, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Emoji Company GmbH (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Emoji Company GmbH; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20659102. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less