This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 13:52:20 (UTC).

Blackledge v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 Blackledge filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-23615

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shannon T. Blackledge

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Michael Dell

Alexander Arthur Palamara

Defendant Attorney

Hector Ralph Rivera

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16933028, filed by Shannon T. Blackledge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A)(Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #3

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (nwn) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shannon T. Blackledge. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 9/25/2023, response/answer due 10/16/2023. (Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/16/2023. By October 16, 2023, the parties, including governmental parties, must file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/25/2023. See attached document for full details. (wce) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#6

(#6) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Shannon T. Blackledge (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Calendar Call set for 7/9/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Bench Trial set for 7/15/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 11/14/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2024. Motions due by 3/5/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/2/2024. ORDER Mediation Deadline 2/27/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Hector Ralph Rivera added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Rivera, Hector) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Rivera, Hector) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shannon T. Blackledge (Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION FOR THE PARTIES TO APPEAR BY VIDEOCONFERENCE AT THE FEBRUARY 8, 2024 MEDIATION filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING Parties and their counsel may appear by videoconference at the February 8, 2024 mediation.)(Rivera, Hector) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order GRANTING Parties and their counsel may appear by videocon

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for the Parties to Appear by Video Conference at the February 8, 2023 Mediation. The parties shall file a report of the mediation within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (mei) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Joint MOTION FOR THE PARTIES TO APPEAR BY VIDEOCONFERENCE AT THE FEBRUARY 8, 2024 MEDIATION filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING Parties and their counsel may appear by videoconference at the February 8, 2024 mediation.)(Rivera, Hector) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shannon T. Blackledge (Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Rivera, Hector) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Hector Ralph Rivera added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Rivera, Hector) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Calendar Call set for 7/9/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Bench Trial set for 7/15/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 11/14/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2024. Motions due by 3/5/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/2/2024. ORDER Mediation Deadline 2/27/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Shannon T. Blackledge (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/16/2023. By October 16, 2023, the parties, including governmental parties, must file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/25/2023. See attached document for full details. (wce) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shannon T. Blackledge. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 9/25/2023, response/answer due 10/16/2023. (Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (nwn) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16933028, filed by Shannon T. Blackledge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A)(Palamara, Alexander) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less